# Flashcards and Practice Video

## Mastering Multiplication with the Area Model: 78 x 65

To further solidify your understanding of multiplying using the area model, we've created a set of flashcards and a practice video that you can download or watch. These resources will help you test yourself and ensure that you grasp the concept thoroughly.

## Our Guide to Multiplying with the Area Model

###### Understanding the Basics

When multiplying 78 by 65 using the area model, we break down each number into its place values and multiply each part separately, then sum the results.

###### Step-by-Step Breakdown

**Multiply Ones Place**:5×8=405 \times 8 = 405×8=40

**Multiply Tens and Ones**:5×70=3505 \times 70 = 3505×70=350

**Multiply Tens and Ones (Swapped)**:60×8=48060 \times 8 = 48060×8=480

**Multiply Tens Place**:60×70=420060 \times 70 = 420060×70=4200

###### Adding the Partial Products

Next, we add all the partial products together:

404040

350350350

480480480

420042004200

Summing these values: 40+350+480+4200=507040 + 350 + 480 + 4200 = 507040+350+480+4200=5070

Thus, 78×65=507078 \times 65 = 507078×65=5070.

###### Visualizing with the Area Model

Imagine a rectangle where the length is broken into 70 and 8, and the width into 60 and 5. This rectangle is divided into four smaller rectangles, each representing a partial product of the original multiplication. By calculating the area of each smaller rectangle and summing them, you get the total area, which corresponds to the product of 78 and 65.

**5 x 8**: 404040**5 x 70**: 350350350**60 x 8**: 480480480**60 x 70**: 420042004200

By understanding each step and visualizing it with the area model, you can master the multiplication of larger numbers in a more intuitive way.

###### Conclusion

Using the area model to multiply numbers like 78 and 65 not only simplifies the process but also helps in understanding the logic behind multiplication. Be sure to visit Khan Academy for a detailed video explanation, and don't forget to use our flashcards and practice video to reinforce your learning!

When it comes to understanding multiplication, especially with larger numbers, one of the most effective methods is using the area model. A great resource to learn this method is available on Khan Academy, where Sal Khan provides an excellent explanation and step-by-step video guide on multiplying 78 by 65. You can watch the full video tutorial here.